House
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 23
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Hill
|
|
|