Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1711 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill February 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2022
Bill February 13, 2021