Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative CrosswhiteHader |