House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Ayes: 74 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
SA's adoption rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Fourth Reading and signing rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Recalled from enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stearman, Stark, Caldwell (Chad), CrosswhiteHader, Williams, Olsen, West (Rick), Gann, Bashore, Kendrix, Smith, Grego, Pfeiffer, Martinez, Roe, Sneed, Marti, Steagall, Russ, Conley
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Ayes: 69 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Remove as principal author Representative Conley and substitute with Representative West (Kevin)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Conley
|
|
|