Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 15 | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Pae |