House
|
05/24/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/21/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named David, Paxton, Jech, Rader, Brooks, Matthews
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Townley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Roberts (Eric)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|