Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1795 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021