House
|
05/05/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Manger
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Eric)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|