Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1821 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021