LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1876
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB1876
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB1876
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 20, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 19, 2021
Compare
Bill
February 19, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 29, 2021
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 24, 2021
Compare
Bill
February 11, 2021
Compare