Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Roe |