House | 03/11/2021 | Returned to General Order | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 75 Nays: 9 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 56 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osburn | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Martinez | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |