House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Bell
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wolfley, Roberts (Eric)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boatman
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Martinez
|
|
|