Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1935 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2021