House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Remove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Martinez
|
|
|