Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1940 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill February 21, 2022
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2021