House
|
05/02/2022
|
Vetoed 05/02/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Withdrawn from General Government committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Nollan
|
|
|