Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1964 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 26, 2021