House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Caldwell (Trey)
|
|
|