Senate | 04/08/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 33 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Townley |