Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2009 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2009 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
April 5, 2021 
 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2009 	By: Townley, West (Josh) and 
Bell of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Coleman of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to public health; amending 63 O.S. 
2011, Section 1-317, as last amended by Sect ion 2, 
Chapter 305, O.S.L. 2019 (63 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 
1-317), which relates to death certificates; 
authorizing an advanced practice registered nurse to 
sign a death certificate; and providing an effective 
date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPL E OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY    63 O.S. 2011, Section 1 -317, as 
last amended by Section 2, Chapter 305, O.S.L. 2019 (63 O.S. Supp. 
2020, Section 1-317), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 1-317.  A.  A death certificate for each death which 
occurs in this state shall be filed with the State Department of 
Health, within three (3) days after such death. 
B.  The funeral director shall personally sign the death 
certificate and shall be responsible for filing the d eath 
certificate. If the funeral director is not available, the person   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2009 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
acting as such who first assumes custody of a dead body in 
accordance with Section 1158 of Title 21 of the Oklahoma Statutes 
shall personally sign and file the death certificate.  The personal 
data shall be obtained from the next of kin or the best qualifie d 
person or source available.  The certificate shall be completed as 
to personal data and delivered to the attending physician or the 
medical examiner responsible for completing the m edical 
certification portion of the certificate of death within twenty -four 
(24) hours after the death.  No later than July 1, 2012, the 
personal data, and no later than July 1, 2017, the medical 
certificate portion, shall be entered into the prescribed el ectronic 
system provided by the State Registrar of Vital Statistics and t he 
information submitted to the State Registrar of Vital Statistics.  
The resultant certificate produced by the electronic system shall be 
provided to the physician or medical examine r for medical 
certification within twenty -four (24) hours after the death . 
C.  The medical certification shall be completed and signed 
within forty-eight (48) hours after death by the physician or 
advanced practice registered nurse in charge of the patient 's care 
for the illness or condition which resulted in death, except when 
inquiry as to the cause of death is required by Section 938 of this 
title.  No later than July 1, 2017, the medical certification 
portion of certificate data shall be entered into th e prescribed 
electronic system provided by the State Registrar of Vital   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2009 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Statistics and the information submitted to the State Registrar of 
Vital Statistics. 
D.  In the event that the physician or advanced practice 
registered nurse in charge of the patient' s care for the illness or 
condition which resulted in death is not in att endance at the time 
of death, the medical certification shall be completed and signed 
within forty-eight (48) hours after death by the physician or 
advanced practice registered nurse in attendance at the time of 
death, except: 
1.  When the patient is under hospice care at the time of death, 
the medical certification may be signed by the hospice's medical 
director; and 
2.  When inquiry as to the cause of death is required by Section 
938 of this title. 
Provided, that such certification, if signed by other tha n the 
attending physician or advanced practice registered nurse , shall 
note on the face the name of the attending physician or advanced 
practice registered nurse and that the informat ion shown is only as 
reported. 
E.  A certifier completing cause of death on a certificate of 
death who knows that a lethal drug, overdose or other means of 
assisting suicide within the meaning of Sections 3141.2 through 
3141.4 of this title caused or contr ibuted to the death shall list 
that means among the chain of events under cause of death or list it   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2009 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
in the box that describes how the injury occurred.  If such means is 
in the chain of events under cause of death or in the box that 
describes how the injury occurred, the certifier shall indicate 
"suicide" as the manner of death. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES 
April 5, 2021 - DO PASS