Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2009 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021