Senate | 04/14/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 31 | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Johns | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Townley |