Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2010 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2022