Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Remove Representative Fetgatter as principal House author and substitute with Representative Steagall
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|