House
|
04/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dills, CrosswhiteHader, Kendrix, Townley, Roberts (Sean), Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative ODonnell
|
|
|