House
|
05/09/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore, Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Taylor; authored by Senator Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Referred to Energy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Withdrawn from General Government committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Remove Representative ODonnell as principal House author and substitute with Representative McBride
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative ODonnell
|
|
|