Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2034 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2022

Amended

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill February 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 18, 2021