Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2021