Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2054 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2021