Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
remove as coauthor Representative(s) Conley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Baker
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 22
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad), Hilbert, Conley, Davis, Hasenbeck, Echols, ODonnell, West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|