Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by West (Kevin)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Russ
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David), Lawson, Roe, Roberts (Sean), Dills, Frix, Hill, Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
CR; Do Pass States Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to States Rights
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall, ODonnell
|
|
|