House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall, ODonnell
|
|
|