House
|
04/26/2021
|
Vetoed 04/23/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Technology Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Technology
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|