House
|
05/11/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Boles, Johns, Phillips, Lawson, Burns, Hilbert, Sterling, Roe, Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens, Hicks, Taylor
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Townley, Frix, Grego, Newton, Moore
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McEntire
|
|
|