House
|
04/22/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Johns
|
|
|