Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2183 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2021