Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Frix | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Johns |