House
|
04/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|