House
|
05/27/2021
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Taylor, Allen, Daniels, Jech, Boren, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Energy
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|