Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Amended

Bill April 12, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2021