House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Gann
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Haste, Dugger, Rosino, Stephens, Hall, Young, Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Withdrawn from General Government committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Sims
|
|
|