Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2233 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill April 11, 2022
Bill February 23, 2021