House
|
05/03/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
|
|
|