House
|
05/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
remove as coauthor Representative(s) Frix
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Frix
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
SCs changed Brooks, Matthews, Paxton, Quinn, Stanley, Taylor to Paxton, Quinn, Montgomery, Hamilton, Jett, Newhouse, Taylor, Thompson, Daniels, Rader, Boren, Floyd, Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, Quinn, Taylor, Stanley, Brooks, Matthews
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Withdrawn from Retirement and Insurance committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 38; Ayes: 51 Nays: 38
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
|
|
|