Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2293 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021