Senate | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |