House
|
04/26/2021
|
Vetoed 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|