Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021