Senate | 03/30/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Treat | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator Coleman | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Frix |